Global patent index - EP 0787248 B1

EP 0787248 B1 2000-01-26 - EXHAUST-GAS SYSTEM FOR AN INTERNAL-COMBUSTION ENGINE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE MANIFOLD OF SUCH A SYSTEM

Title (en)

EXHAUST-GAS SYSTEM FOR AN INTERNAL-COMBUSTION ENGINE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE MANIFOLD OF SUCH A SYSTEM

Title (de)

ABGASANLAGE EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER SAMMELKAMMER EINER ABGASANLAGE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'ECHAPPEMENT POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DU COLLECTEUR D'UN SYSTEME D'ECHAPPEMENT

Publication

EP 0787248 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96925760 A

Priority

  • DE 19526086 A
  • EP 9603124 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19526086A1] The internal-combustion-engine exhaust-gas system proposed has a manifold (10) with a wall (17) in the surface of which at least one exhaust pipe (8) ends. The wall (17) is made of a flat steel sheet which has been wound round and joined together at a longitudinal seam (20) to form a cylindrical tube. The point or points of entry (21) of the exhaust pipes (8) are at a distance from this longitudinal seam (20).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 7/18; F01N 7/08; F01N 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/28 (2006.01); F01N 13/04 (2010.01); F01N 13/08 (2010.01); F01N 13/10 (2010.01); F01N 13/18 (2010.01); F01N 13/02 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 13/18 (2013.01); F01N 3/28 (2013.01); F01N 13/009 (2014.06); F01N 13/04 (2013.01); F01N 13/08 (2013.01); F01N 13/10 (2013.01); F01N 2450/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19526086 A1 19970123; EP 0787248 A1 19970806; EP 0787248 B1 20000126; JP H10510025 A 19980929; WO 9704223 A1 19970206

INPADOC legal status

2005-07-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050716

2002-05-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-03-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020329

2002-03-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20010716

2001-07-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010716

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-07-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000727

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-07-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000718

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-07-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000713

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-04-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000320

2000-03-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59604294

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-02

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-09-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1998-11-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981002

1997-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970127

1997-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT