Global Patent Index - EP 0787358 B1

EP 0787358 B1 2001-01-17 - OPTOCOMPONENT CAPSULE HAVING AN OPTICAL INTERFACE

Title (en)

OPTOCOMPONENT CAPSULE HAVING AN OPTICAL INTERFACE

Title (de)

KAPSEL FÜR EIN OPTOELEKTRISCHES BAUELEMENT MIT EINER OPTISCHEN SCHNITTSTELLE

Title (fr)

CAPSULE POUR OPTOCOMPOSANT A INTERFACE OPTIQUE

Publication

EP 0787358 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95936160 A

Priority

  • SE 9501233 W
  • SE 9403574 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9613069A1] In encapsulating an optocomponent with a plastics material an MT-connector compatible interface is obtained having bores (107) for guide pins in the wall of the capsule and optical connection surfaces (110). These bores (107) are obtained from mould cavity guide pins which are used for aligning the optocomponent in a mould cavity in a mould in the moulding operation of the encapsulating material on top of the component. In order to achieve a good accuracy in the positioning of the component during the moulding operation the mould guide pins are as short as possible and end directly behind the component where they are supported by projections extending from each mould half. Thus cavities (109) are created extending straight through the capsule (105) behind the component. The cavities (109) allow that the guide pin bores (107) are cleansed and that material residues are removed after the moulding operation. Further, the cavities (109) can be used for spring clamps which are used for retaining the optocomponent capsule (105) at an optical connector having a similar interface. The clamps can then have tongues which are inserted in the cavities (109) and which, in addition, can be provided with holes, through which the guide pins can be pushed to safe-guard the clamp against being lost.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 31/02; G02B 6/00; B29C 33/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B29C 33/00 (2006.01); B29C 45/14 (2006.01); G02B 6/42 (2006.01); H01L 31/0203 (2006.01); H01L 31/0232 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B29C 45/14065 (2013.01); B29C 33/0033 (2013.01); G02B 6/4201 (2013.01); G02B 6/4249 (2013.01); G02B 6/4255 (2013.01); H01L 31/0203 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9613069 A1 19960502; AU 3820095 A 19960515; CA 2203112 A1 19960502; CA 2203112 C 20050419; CN 1107982 C 20030507; CN 1170475 A 19980114; DE 69519938 D1 20010222; DE 69519938 T2 20010517; EP 0787358 A1 19970806; EP 0787358 B1 20010117; ES 2153500 T3 20010301; FI 971656 A0 19970418; FI 971656 A 19970619; HK 1007904 A1 20040206; JP H10507848 A 19980728; KR 100272031 B1 20001115; SE 9403574 D0 19941019; SE 9403574 L 19960420; US 5985185 A 19991116

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091019

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081019

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081029

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081201

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061020

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071029

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20061020

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070629

2007-07-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070501

2007-06-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2006-10-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061020

2005-10-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20051027

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-10-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20051026

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-10-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051017

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-09-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050929

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-03-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: FUMERO BREVETTI S.N.C.

2001-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153500 T3

2001-02-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69519938 20010222

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

1998-05-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980408

1997-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970405

1997-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL SE