Global Patent Index - EP 0787456 B1

EP 0787456 B1 2000-08-16 - Bathtub with automatic door and plug

Title (en)

Bathtub with automatic door and plug

Title (de)

Badewanne mit automatischer Tür und Abflusszapfen

Title (fr)

Baignoire avec porte et bonde automatiques

Publication

EP 0787456 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96203036 A

Priority

CH 307295 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0787456A2] The panel (2A) fits a sealed opening (43) near the tub (1) waste (71). In lowering, it retracts under the bath, leaving a step for the user. The panel operates within an aluminium chassis (4) carried on two fixed metal frames cradling the e.g. acrylic tub. A 12v DC motor drives the panel via endless chains attached on either side. Pegs on the panel side faces (37.5) run in roughly vertical (5) and horizontal curved guide-slots in the chassis sides. The vertical slots' final top alignment firmly closes the panel against the compressible seal (43). The gap between the side trim panels (79A,79B) is closed by a roller shutter, also operated by the motor. The access, and the motorised waste valve (71), was push-button controlled (67).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0787456 A2 19970806; EP 0787456 A3 19970813; EP 0787456 B1 20000816; CH 688675 A5 19980115

INPADOC legal status


2001-08-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2001-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-06-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010629

2001-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-02-14 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH FR GB IT LI

2000-08-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-08-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000816

1999-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990303

1998-08-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980611

1997-10-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

1997-09-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH FR GB IT LI

1997-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1997-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH FR GB IT LI