Global Patent Index - EP 0787515 B1

EP 0787515 B1 2001-12-05 - A game machine

Title (en)

A game machine

Title (de)

Spielmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de jeu

Publication

EP 0787515 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97101571 A

Priority

JP 3568796 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0787515A1] A game machine provided with moving means running on a specified race track includes drive controlling means for controlling the moving means to run on the specified race track which is selected from among a plurality of race tracks. The game machine can keep game players amused for a longer period of time and change a layout of race track in a shorter period and with a lower cost. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63F 9/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 9/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63F 9/143 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0787515 A1 19970806; EP 0787515 B1 20011205; CN 1163285 C 20040825; CN 1167000 A 19971210; DE 69708709 D1 20020117; DE 69708709 T2 20020822; JP 2940860 B2 19990825; JP H09206474 A 19970812; TW 369428 B 19990911

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110131

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100202

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-06-10 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090514 AND 20090520

2005-08-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050802

2004-02-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040212

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69708709 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2001-12-05 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: A GAME MACHINE

1999-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990602

1997-11-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970919

1997-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB