Global patent index - EP 0787597 B1

EP 0787597 B1 2000-04-26 - Process of mounting a sleeve for an intaglio or a flexographic printing cylinder

Title (en)

Process of mounting a sleeve for an intaglio or a flexographic printing cylinder

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Aufziehen einer Hülse für eine Tiefdruck- oder Flexodruckwalze

Title (fr)

Procédé de montage d'un manchon pour cylindre d'impression en creux ou flexographique

Publication

EP 0787597 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96117604 A

Priority

DE 19603500 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0787597A2] The printing roll has a sleeve comprising a basic sleeve (1) made of glass fibre-reinforced plastics and additional layers. The roll axle and the basic sleeve are slightly tapered and the basic sleeve has an axial key (6) which engages a slot in the roll axle. Preferably the taper amounts to approximately 2 mm variation in diameter over the length of the sleeve. Additional layers for rotogravure printing comprise a layer of compressible material (2), layer of plastics foam (3), an aluminium tube (4), and an electrolytically deposited engravable copper layer (5). For flexographic printing, the outermost layer is made of a cast or rigid foam material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41N 1/22; B41C 1/18; B41F 27/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 5/24 (2006.01); B41C 1/18 (2006.01); B41F 13/10 (2006.01); B41F 13/11 (2006.01); B41N 1/20 (2006.01); B41N 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41N 1/22 (2013.01); B41C 1/182 (2013.01); B41N 1/20 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49558 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0787597 A2 19970806; EP 0787597 A3 19980107; EP 0787597 B1 20000426; AT 192086 T 20000515; CA 2195905 A1 19970801; DE 19603500 A1 19970807; DK 0787597 T3 20000925; JP 2975567 B2 19991110; JP H09207308 A 19970812; US 5784961 A 19980728

INPADOC legal status

2007-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2005-11-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051122

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051104

2004-06-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20031104

2003-11-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031104

2003-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2002-11-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021104

2002-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021030

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20020601

2002-07-22 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2002-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020601

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-14 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011114

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-11-04 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011104

2001-09-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010925

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-07-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2001-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: POLYWEST KUNSTSTOFFTECHNIK SAUERESSIG & PARTNER G

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20001130

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-11-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001130

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001130

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-09-25 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-07-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000626

2000-07-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: KARAGHIOSOFF GIORGIO

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605042

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-31

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-04-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 192086

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-09-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: PROCESS OF MOUNTING A SLEEVE FOR AN INTAGLIO OR A FLEXOGRAPHIC PRINTING CYLINDER

1999-02-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981218

1998-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971218

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1997-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE