Global Patent Index - EP 0787647 B1

EP 0787647 B1 2001-04-04 - Device to reduce the sound emanating from the gear system of a ship propeller

Title (en)

Device to reduce the sound emanating from the gear system of a ship propeller

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Getriebegeräuschminderung eines Schiffspropellers

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour réduire le bruit d'un système d'engrenages d'une hélice marine

Publication

EP 0787647 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96120877 A

Priority

DE 19603484 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0787647A1] The driven gearwheel (22) is connected to the rotor shaft (11) by a rotationally flexible and spatially movable coupling (15,25). Both the gear with its gear housing (20) supporting the gear wheels (21,22) and also the mounting of the rotor (12) in the rotor shaft housing (10) are formed as a separate unit. The rotor shaft housing elastically supporting the gear housing is rigidly installed in the ship's bottom (1). Non-metallic elastic intermediate elements (25) are located between the rigid coupling elements of the driven gearwheel and rotor shaft.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63H 1/10; B63H 23/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63H 1/10 (2006.01); B63H 23/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63H 1/10 (2013.01); B63H 23/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0787647 A1 19970806; EP 0787647 B1 20010404; DE 19603484 A1 19970807

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151224

2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151224

2016-09-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160831

2016-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151224

2016-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59606718

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141223

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141211

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606718 20010510

2001-04-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990723

1997-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971029

1997-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT