Global patent index - EP 0787648 A3

EP 0787648 A3 2000-03-29 - Packing machine particularly for cigarettes, or similar

Title (en)

Packing machine particularly for cigarettes, or similar

Title (de)

Verpackungsmaschine,insbesondere für Zigaretten oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Machine d'emballage spécialement pour des cigarettes ou similaires

Publication

EP 0787648 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 96120964 A

Priority

IT SV960002 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0787648A2] Packaging machine, especially for cigarettes, comprising a station (SA) for bringing together a pre-ordered group of cigarettes and a wrapper sheet in which said group is later wrapped and from which station (SA) the sheet is transferred together with the cigarettes to a subsequent unit (4) which folds the sheet around the group of cigarettes; means (5, 7) for feeding the group of cigarettes along a defined path (1B) to the bringing-together/transfer station (SA); and means (11, 11') for feeding a sheet, along a defined path different from that of the cigarettes, to the bringing-together/transfer station (SA). According to the invention, the sheet feed means (11, 11') and the means (15, 16, 18, 18', 19) for actuating these and the cigarette feed means (5, 7) are situated and are constructed in such a way that at least the cigarette feed path (1B) is at least partially free, on one or more of its sides, at least in the part associated with the bringing-together/transfer station (SA). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 19/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 19/22 (2006.01); B65B 41/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 19/228 (2013.01); B65B 41/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0787648 A2 19970806; EP 0787648 A3 20000329; EP 0787648 B1 20020731; DE 69622682 D1 20020905; DE 69622682 T2 20030403; IT 1288126 B1 19980910; IT SV960002 A1 19970703; IT SV960002 D0 19960103

INPADOC legal status

2006-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2005-10-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20041227

2004-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041231

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-12-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041227

2003-12-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031215

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-12-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031210

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-07-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030506

2002-10-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-09-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69622682

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-09-05

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-07-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-07-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SASIB S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-07-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 65B 19/22 A, 7B 65B 41/06 B

2001-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001123

2000-04-19 [D17D] SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: D17D

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-06-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SASIB TOBACCO S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-04-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980212

1997-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB