Global Patent Index - EP 0787674 B1

EP 0787674 B1 2001-05-23 - Unnecessary yarn removal method and device for a winding package

Title (en)

Unnecessary yarn removal method and device for a winding package

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Entfernen von überflüssigem Faden einer Spule

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif d'enlèvement du fil superflu d'une bobine

Publication

EP 0787674 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96120196 A

Priority

JP 4208596 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0787674A2] The present invention is characterized by removal of the yarn end wound last onto the full package on an auto-winder when doffing is carried out. As a result, when doffing is carried out after yarn joining once a package (4) has become full, removal is possible of the joint (2c) of the yarn existing at the yarn end wound last onto the full package. Furthermore, when one winding package (4) is formed from one supply yarn package (1,1A), removal is possible of the inner layer yarn part (often damaged) of the supply package (1,1A).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 67/04; B65H 54/88

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/22 (2006.01); B65H 54/86 (2006.01); B65H 54/88 (2006.01); B65H 67/08 (2006.01); B65H 73/00 (2006.01); D01H 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/88 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0787674 A2 19970806; EP 0787674 A3 19980114; EP 0787674 B1 20010523; CN 1159419 A 19970917; DE 69612953 D1 20010628; DE 69612953 T2 20020328; JP 3572782 B2 20041006; JP H09208130 A 19970812

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081216

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071221

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071221

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020129

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-11-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-08-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612953 20010628

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1999-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990715

1998-04-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980302

1998-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1997-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT