Global Patent Index - EP 0787845 B1

EP 0787845 B1 2002-11-06 - METHOD OF PREPARING TREATING LIQUID IN CIRCULATING SYSTEM OF CLOTH TREATING MACHINE AND TREATING CLOTH WITH THE LIQUID, AND CLOTH TREATING MACHINE HAVING THE FUNCTION

Title (en)

METHOD OF PREPARING TREATING LIQUID IN CIRCULATING SYSTEM OF CLOTH TREATING MACHINE AND TREATING CLOTH WITH THE LIQUID, AND CLOTH TREATING MACHINE HAVING THE FUNCTION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM VORBEREITEN EINER BEHANDLUNGSFLÜSSIGKEIT IM FLÜSSIGKEITSKREISLAUF EINER TEXTILBEHANDLUNGSMASCHINE SOWIE VERFAHREN UND MASCHINE ZUR NASSBEHANDLUNG VON TEXTILGUT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR PREPARER UN LIQUIDE DE TRAITEMENT DANS UN SYSTEME CIRCULANT D'UNE MACHINE POUR TRAITER DES TISSUS, TRAITEMENT DE TISSUS AVEC LE LIQUIDE ET MACHINE A TRAITER LES TISSUS AYANT CETTE FONCTION

Publication

EP 0787845 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96909380 A

Priority

  • JP 9601037 W
  • JP 21054795 A
  • JP 21055095 A
  • JP 24760695 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9707276A1] An improved technique of supplying a treating liquid for a cloth treating machine, including a method of preparing the liquid for treating cloth in the cloth treating machine and a cloth treating machine having the function. A cloth treating liquid having a predetermined concentration is prepared by inputting a powder agent for increasing the fluid friction of a solvent into a powder agent inputting/agitating section in a treating liquid circulating system of the cloth treating machine, or by inputting the powder agent into the solvent in a flow path where the solvent has a large fluid friction locally in the circulating system, and by agitating the powder agent exploiting the fluid friction. The prepared cloth treating liquid is circulated in the treating liquid circulating system to rationally treat the cloth.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06B 3/24; D06B 9/02; D06B 21/02; D06B 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06B 3/28 (2006.01); D06B 23/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06B 3/28 (2013.01); D06B 23/205 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9707276 A1 19970227; CN 1087795 C 20020717; CN 1154150 A 19970709; DE 69624675 D1 20021212; DE 69624675 T2 20030724; EP 0787845 A1 19970806; EP 0787845 A4 19990616; EP 0787845 B1 20021106; HK 1001867 A1 20030221; JP 3559287 B2 20040825; KR 100236620 B1 20000302; TW 304210 B 19970501

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070416

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070416

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071101

2007-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070416

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-04-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060413

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-04-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060412

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69624675 20021212

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2000-11-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000918

1999-06-16 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19990504

1999-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

1997-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970523

1997-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT