Global patent index - EP 0787864 B1

EP 0787864 B1 2001-02-21 - Sanitary security device

Title (en)

Sanitary security device

Title (de)

Sanitäre Sicherungseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de sécurité sanitaire

Publication

EP 0787864 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96120231 A

Priority

DE 19603393 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0787864A1] There is a flow rate regulator (2), flow rate limiter or similar throttle valve. This and at least one backflow preventer (3) are combined to form a unit as a cartridge (1) which can be inserted as a sanitary safety device in a water line. The cartridge preferably has a screen (8) attached to it on the inflow side and the components may be mounted in a cartridge housing (9) having supports (10,11) in the form of stepwise displaced ring collars or shoulders on the inside wall for the safety device or backflow preventer or screen. A seal may be provided between the outer shell of the cartridge housing and the inside wall of the water line.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03C 1/08; E03C 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/08 (2006.01); E03C 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/106 (2013.01); E03C 1/08 (2013.01); E03C 2001/026 (2013.01); Y10T 137/7504 (2015.04); Y10T 137/7933 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0787864 A1 19970806; EP 0787864 B1 20010221; AT 199271 T 20010315; DE 19603393 A1 19970807; US 5743291 A 19980428

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2016-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59606466

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141217

- Year of fee payment: 19

2005-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2003-12-19 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031219

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-02-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-12-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011217

2001-07-20 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-04-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-03-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59606466

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-03-29

2001-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: HANS RUDOLF GACHNANG PATENTANWALT

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES IT LI

2001-02-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20010221

2001-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 199271

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-03-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-03-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990607

1999-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990607

1997-08-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970613

1997-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES IT LI