Global Patent Index - EP 0787871 B1

EP 0787871 B1 2001-04-04 - Use of an accessory for awning or tent

Title (en)

Use of an accessory for awning or tent

Title (de)

Verwendung eines Zubehörteil für Vorzelt oder Zelt

Title (fr)

Utilisation d'un accessoire pour auvent ou toile de tente

Publication

EP 0787871 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97420018 A

Priority

FR 9601443 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0787871A1] The ground strip (7) is made from a waterproof and washable or disposable material and is fastened to the lower edge of a tent or awning wall (4) to keep out damp and draughts. The strip is held in place by temporary fastenings such as strips (11,12) of hook and loop material, sliding clasp fasteners, or an edge bead on one component which engages with an open-sided plastics tube on the other. The strip could be manufactured to a standard width and sold off the roll so that any required length could be purchased.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 15/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 15/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 15/32 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

FR 2243604 A1 19750404 - COLLET NOEL [FR]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0787871 A1 19970806; EP 0787871 B1 20010404; EP 0787871 B2 20041103; DE 69704442 D1 20010510; DE 69704442 T2 20010726; FR 2744476 A1 19970808; FR 2744476 B1 19980710

INPADOC legal status


2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110930

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091113

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-11-03 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

2004-08-04 [RTI2] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: USE OF AN ACCESSORY FOR AWNING OR TENT

2003-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-09-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030130

2003-01-24 [REG FR CL] CONCESSION TO GRANT LICENSES

2002-12-17 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20021217

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HOLTKAMP B.V.

2002-03-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HOLTKAMP B.V.

- Effective date: 20020104

2002-02-05 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020205

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020122

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-16 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020116

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020115

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010702

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69704442 20010510

2001-04-12 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

2000-07-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000602

1998-01-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971120

1997-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB LI NL