Global patent index - EP 0787874 B1

EP 0787874 B1 2000-11-08 - Electronic doorlock

Title (en)

Electronic doorlock

Title (de)

Elektronisches Türschloss

Title (fr)

Serrure électronique pour porte

Publication

EP 0787874 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97100986 A

Priority

DE 19603200 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0787874A1] The lock has an external door knob (12) which is rotated to open the door (A) when the correct code is entered via the keypad. It is coupled mechanically to the adaptor (3) whose casing (31) within the door encloses a roller (32) surrounded by a co-rotating boss (33) and engaging a latching plate (34) on a shaft (4). The casing has a hollow cylindrical portion with a massive radial projection containing two transverse slots which accept the boss and the latching plate respectively. The shaft has one or more circumferential grooves constituting weaker sections between the adaptor and the external knob.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 47/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/06 (2006.01); E05B 63/00 (2006.01); E05B 15/16 (2006.01); E05B 17/00 (2006.01); E05B 47/00 (2006.01); G07C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/0615 (2013.01); E05B 47/0657 (2013.01); E05B 63/0034 (2013.01); E05B 63/0056 (2013.01); E05B 15/1614 (2013.01); E05B 17/0054 (2013.01); E05B 63/0065 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0058 (2013.01); G07C 9/00674 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29607944 U1 19970605; DE 19603200 A1 19970807; DE 19603200 C2 19981224; EP 0787874 A1 19970806; EP 0787874 B1 20001108

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160131

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-01-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050123

2004-09-15 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040123

2004-01-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040123

2003-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-02-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030212

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030212

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-10-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-01-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-12-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59702580

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-12-14

2000-12-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-11-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20001108

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991006

1998-04-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980203

1997-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT