Global patent index - EP 0787879 B1

EP 0787879 B1 2000-05-17 - Lower finishing part of doors or windows

Title (en)

Lower finishing part of doors or windows

Title (de)

Unterer Abschluss von Türen oder Fenstern

Title (fr)

Finition en partie inférieure de portes ou de fenêtres

Publication

EP 0787879 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96115027 A

Priority

DE 19603412 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0787879A2] The bottom mounting (1) has a profile (2) with an upper (3) a lower (4) and inner (5) and an outer (6) side. A ratchet unit (12,13) is near the outer side (6), at the level of the upper side (3). The ratchet unit (12,13) has a space (13) with an opening (12). A further ratchet (14) is at the under side (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 1/56; E06B 1/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/56 (2006.01); E06B 1/60 (2006.01); E06B 1/62 (2006.01); E06B 1/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/62 (2013.01); E06B 1/6053 (2013.01); E06B 1/70 (2013.01); E06B 2001/626 (2013.01); E06B 2001/628 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0787879 A2 19970806; EP 0787879 A3 19980610; EP 0787879 B1 20000517; AT 193088 T 20000615; AT 222988 T 20020915; CZ 293125 B6 20040218; CZ 9700010 A3 19980812; DE 19603412 A1 19970807; DE 19654992 C2 19990204; EP 0867589 A2 19980930; EP 0867589 A3 19990506; EP 0898040 A2 19990224; EP 0898040 A3 19990506; EP 0898040 B1 20020828; PL 182478 B1 20020131; PL 317087 A1 19970804

INPADOC legal status

2011-01-19 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20100912

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080919

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-09-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070921

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-09-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050919

2005-03-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: GRETSCH-UNITAS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2005-03-02 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN2

- Inventor name: WILLRICH, PETER

2001-06-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2001-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2001-04-18 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: BKV BAU-UND KUNSTSTOFFTECHNISCHE ENTWICKLUNGS-UND

- Effective date: 20010216

2001-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: WILLRICH PETER

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-11-15 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-09-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000919

2000-08-17 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605244

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-21

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: DIPL.-ING. ETH H. R. WERFFELI PATENTANWALT

2000-05-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DR. ING. AUSSERER ANTON

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI

2000-05-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 193088

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-06-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WILLRICH, PETER

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-06-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WILLRICH, PETER

1999-02-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981222

1998-12-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981030

1998-06-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI

1997-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI