Global Patent Index - EP 0787893 B1

EP 0787893 B1 2001-04-04 - Valve drive comprising pneumatic return spring for an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Valve drive comprising pneumatic return spring for an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Ventiltrieb für Brennkraftmaschinen mit einer pneumatischen Schliessfeder für ein Gaswechselventil

Title (fr)

Commande de soupape à ressort de rappel pneumatique pour moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0787893 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96119256 A

Priority

DE 19603536 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0787893A1] The valve actuator comprises a locking spring (7) cylinder (10) which is arranged at least in the lift area of the locking spring piston (14) with cooling medium force-circulated in the cooling jacket (22) of the liquid cooled internal combustion engine. The housing (9) for location of the locking spring has a circumferential slot (19) extending over the lift area of the locking spring piston for a cooling medium directing chamber (18) formed with the cylinder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 1/46; F01P 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/46 (2006.01); F01P 3/14 (2006.01); F01P 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/465 (2013.01); F01P 3/14 (2013.01); F01P 2003/006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0787893 A1 19970806; EP 0787893 B1 20010404; DE 19603536 A1 19970807; DE 19603536 C2 19990114

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-21 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20161201

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2016-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59606719

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151229

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151228

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151217

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-12-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141216

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59606719

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-10

2001-04-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-04-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-07-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000523

1998-03-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980121

1997-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT