Global Patent Index - EP 0787905 B1

EP 0787905 B1 2002-11-13 - Unit for the distribution of a pressure fluid

Title (en)

Unit for the distribution of a pressure fluid

Title (de)

Einheit zur Verteilung eines Druckmediums

Title (fr)

Unité pour la distribution d'un fluide de pression

Publication

EP 0787905 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97100709 A

Priority

IT MI960087 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0787905A2] The distributor has contact surfaces (7,8) as flat ground surfaces between an intermediate plate (2) and a hydraulic block (6). Cylinder-shaped connections (9) extend from the surface (7) of the intermediate plate, each with a sealing ring (22) within a cylindrical drilling (10) in the housing of the hydraulic block (6). The intermediate plate and housing of the hydraulic block are locked together by screw bonds (25), to force the surface of the intermediate plate in a sealed fit against the surface (8) of the hydraulic block.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/00 (2006.01); F15B 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/0821 (2013.01); E02F 9/2275 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0787905 A2 19970806; EP 0787905 A3 19990908; EP 0787905 B1 20021113; AT 227810 T 20021115; DE 59708685 D1 20021219; IT 240427 Y1 20010402; IT MI960087 U1 19970804

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170116

2017-02-08 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170116

2017-01-17 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59708685

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160113

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160112

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151223

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-12-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-09-26 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120830 AND 20120905

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090117

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-07-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 0787905E

2003-06-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030529

2003-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-02-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030213

2003-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030117

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708685 20021219

2002-12-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-12-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-13 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227810 T 20021115

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010216

1999-12-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FASTER S.R.L.

1999-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

1997-11-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970913

1997-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE