Global Patent Index - EP 0787946 B1

EP 0787946 B1 2000-06-28 - External fluidized bed for equipping a circulating fluidized bed furnace

Title (en)

External fluidized bed for equipping a circulating fluidized bed furnace

Title (de)

Externe Wirbelschicht zur Ausrüstung einer zirkulierenden Wirbelschichtfeuerung

Title (fr)

Lit fluidisé externe destiné à équiper un foyer à lit fluidisé circulant

Publication

EP 0787946 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97400213 A

Priority

FR 9601130 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0787946A1] The fluidised bed is located inside a furnace chamber (2) which receives solids. It has a lower fluidising air feed (3) with injector nozzles (4) situated in the chamber's lower wall (2A). The furnace has a heat exchanger (5) made from a series of parallel tubes connected to an inlet manifold (6) embedded in the lower wall of the chamber. The outlet manifold (7) is situated inside the chamber at the top and has at least one outlet pipe (8) for the heated fluid which passes through the chamber's upper wall (2B). The two manifolds are situated in the chamber's central lengthwise plane, with the inlet manifold situated in a lower wall recess and covered with sand or concrete.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F22B 31/00; F28D 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23C 10/02 (2006.01); F22B 31/00 (2006.01); F28D 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F22B 31/0084 (2013.01); F28D 13/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES GB GR IT PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0787946 A1 19970806; EP 0787946 B1 20000628; CN 1078093 C 20020123; CN 1167651 A 19971217; DE 69702352 D1 20000803; DE 69702352 T2 20010215; DK 0787946 T3 20001016; ES 2148910 T3 20001016; FR 2744037 A1 19970801; FR 2744037 B1 19980227; GR 3034383 T3 20001229; PT 787946 E 20001229; RU 2161283 C2 20001227; ZA 9700779 B 19970813

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-08-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050802

2005-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050130

2004-09-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040130

2004-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040130

2004-01-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040122

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-01-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040108

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-09-01 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2003-08-04 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030804

2003-07-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2002-12-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021227

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-02-20 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020220

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-02 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020102

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-02 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20020102

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20011228

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-12-21 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20011221

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000911

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2148910 T3

2000-10-16 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-09-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-08-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000724

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69702352 20000803

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES GB GR IT PT SE

1999-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990504

1999-06-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM ENERGY SYSTEMS S.A.

1998-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971206

1997-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES GB GR IT PT SE