Global Patent Index - EP 0787954 B1

EP 0787954 B1 2000-05-24 - Air outlet device

Title (en)

Air outlet device

Title (de)

Vorrichtung für die Einführung von Luft

Title (fr)

Dispositif de sortie d'air

Publication

EP 0787954 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96810910 A

Priority

CH 23596 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0787954A2] The injector has several of outlet channels (4) in the leading wall (3) of a housing (2). These give a low turbulence air flow. The channels have a greater length than the dimensions of their cross section. The flow profile (5,6) of the total flow from the openings allows differing permeability and or loading at the outlet wall (3) of the housing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 13/068

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/068 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/068 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FI FR GB LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0787954 A2 19970806; EP 0787954 A3 19980318; EP 0787954 B1 20000524; AT 193369 T 20000615; DE 59605301 D1 20000629; ES 2152508 T3 20010201; NO 310792 B1 20010827; NO 965577 A 19970731; NO 965577 D0 19961227

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161229

2017-01-18 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20161229

2017-01-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-12-30 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59605301

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151218

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150821

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20151031

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-12-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-07-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: TROX HESCO SCHWEIZ AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HESCO (SCHWEIZ) AG, RUETI, CH

- Document: DE 59605301

- Effective date: 20140604

2014-05-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HANSJOERG KLEY, CH

2014-05-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: TROX HESCO SCHWEIZ AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HESCO (SCHWEIZ) AG, CH

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111231

2013-07-03 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130703

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111230

2013-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120701

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 193369 T

- Effective date: 20111230

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-07-31 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-07-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120701

2011-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20101223

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091230

2011-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20101213

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20101214

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20101214

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091230

2009-02-27 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20081215

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-01-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20081219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2152508 T3

2000-08-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605301 20000629

2000-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DIPL.-ING. HORST QUEHL PATENTANWALT

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR GB LI LU NL SE

2000-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193369 T 20000615

2000-01-12 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: AIR OUTLET DEVICE

1999-12-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HESCO (SCHWEIZ) AG

1998-12-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981106

1998-09-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980709

1998-03-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR GB LI LU NL SE

1997-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR GB LI LU NL SE