Global patent index - EP 0788535 B1

EP 0788535 B1 2000-05-03 - NOVEL COBALT CONTAINING DEPOSIT CONTROL ADDITIVES

Title (en)

NOVEL COBALT CONTAINING DEPOSIT CONTROL ADDITIVES

Title (de)

KOBALT ENTHALTENDE ADDITIVE ZUR KONTROLLE VON ABLAGERUNGEN

Title (fr)

NOUVEAUX ADDITIFS A BASE DE COBALT REGULANT LES DEPOTS

Publication

EP 0788535 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95938911 A

Priority

  • US 9513840 W
  • US 32820994 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9612779A1] The present invention provides for lubricating oil compositions that comprise a base oil of lubricating viscosity, a copper containing antioxidant, such as copper naphthenates, oleates and polyisobutylene succinic anhydrides and a cobalt containing antioxidant such as cobalt naphthenates, oleates, stearates and polyisobutylene succinic anhydrides and for the methods of making them. The invention provides enhanced deposit control by virtue of the synergistic effect of the cobalt and copper compounds, and has utility in lube applications.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 129/00; C10M 129/40; C10M 129/58; C10M 129/93

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 129/26 (2006.01); C10M 129/00 (2006.01); C10M 129/40 (2006.01); C10M 129/58 (2006.01); C10M 129/93 (2006.01); C10N 10/02 (2006.01); C10N 10/16 (2006.01); C10N 30/04 (2006.01); C10N 30/10 (2006.01); C10N 40/25 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 129/00 (2013.01); C10M 129/40 (2013.01); C10M 129/58 (2013.01); C10M 129/93 (2013.01); C10M 2207/00 (2013.01); C10M 2207/08 (2013.01); C10M 2207/126 (2013.01); C10M 2207/129 (2013.01); C10M 2207/16 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C10M 129/00 + C10M 129/24 + C10M 129/40 + C10M 129/58 + C10M 129/93

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9612779 A1 19960502; CA 2201960 A1 19960502; DE 69516710 D1 20000608; DE 69516710 T2 20000831; EP 0788535 A1 19970813; EP 0788535 B1 20000503; JP H10508053 A 19980804

INPADOC legal status

2005-10-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051025

2003-08-15 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20030501

2003-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-18 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

2003-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030501

2003-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030501

2003-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021025

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-13 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011113

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011030

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-10-09 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011009

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-10-05 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011005

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-10-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011004

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-03-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: EXXONMOBIL RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2001-01-03 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: EXXONMOBIL RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2000-06-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69516710

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-08

2000-05-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

1998-07-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980604

1997-08-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970523

1997-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL