Global patent index - EP 0788540 A4

EP 0788540 A4 2000-01-12 - HUMAN ABH

Title (en)

HUMAN ABH

Title (de)

MESCHLICHES ABH

Title (fr)

ABH HUMAIN

Publication

EP 0788540 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95901018 A

Priority

US 9412058 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9612791A1] A human hABH polypeptide and DNA (RNA) encoding such polypeptide and a procedure for producing such polypeptide by recombinant techniques is disclosed. Also disclosed are methods for utilizing such polypeptide for the treatment of mutations and the treatment of diseases which result from damaged DNA, for example, cancer. Antagonists against such polypeptides and their use as a therapeutic to augment chemotherapy of cancer cells are also disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/09; A61K 38/17; A61K 48/00; C07K 14/47; C12N 1/21; C12N 15/10; C12N 15/11; C12N 15/12; C12N 15/63; C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12P 21/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/4702 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 9612791A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9612791 A1 19960502; AU 1041195 A 19960515; EP 0788540 A1 19970813; EP 0788540 A4 20000112; JP H10507634 A 19980728

INPADOC legal status

2005-11-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050503

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/09 A

2003-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031002

2000-01-12 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 19991202

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 12N 15/09 A, 7C 12N 1/21 B, 7C 12N 15/10 B, 7C 12N 15/11 B, 7C 12N 15/12 B, 7C 12N 15/63 B, 7C 12Q 1/68 B, 7C 07K 14/47 B, 7A 61K 38/17 B, 7A 61K 48/00 B

1997-08-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970520

1997-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE