Global Patent Index - EP 0788580 B1

EP 0788580 B1 2000-09-20 - FUEL-INJECTED PISTON COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

FUEL-INJECTED PISTON COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

BRENNKRAFTKOLBENMASCHINE MIT KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZUNG

Title (fr)

MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE A PISTON AVEC INJECTION DE CARBURANT

Publication

EP 0788580 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96900531 A

Priority

  • DE 9600078 W
  • DE 19514571 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19514571C1] For known structural reasons, there are so far no fuel-injected piston combustion engines operating at pressure ratios higher the 1:21. It is the purpose of this invention to produce a fuel-injected piston combustion engine operating at pressures from over 1:25 to about 1:40 with a simultaneous pressure drop in the exhaust gases to 1 bar. The Otto-cycle operating mode achieved provides very high efficiencies, resulting in fuel consumptions of under 80g/HPh. As will be seen from fig. 2, this aim is achieved by a design with a centrically rotating cylinder block (10) and a cylinder fitted centrically therein, in which a piston (15) connected to the uncranked mainshaft (13) by a rigid connecting rod (136) rotates in the big-end bearing (14) and the rotation speed ratio between the cylinder block and the mainshaft is 1:1 with no intermediate gearing, so that only deceleration and acceleration forces act on the cylinder block. Production of a fuel-injected piston combustion engine, mainly for transport (automobile) drives to reduce CO2 emissions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02B 57/08; F01B 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01B 13/02 (2006.01); F02B 57/08 (2006.01); F01P 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02B 57/08 (2013.01); F01B 13/02 (2013.01); F01P 2003/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19514571 C1 19960725; EP 0788580 A1 19970813; EP 0788580 B1 20000920; US 6079376 A 20000627; WO 9633342 A1 19961024

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050113

2003-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-01-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030113

2002-01-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020121

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-14 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020114

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BERGISCHE METALLWARENFABRIK DILLENBERG & CO.

- Effective date: 20010131

2001-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010131

2000-12-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-12-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-10-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000921

2000-10-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-09-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000920

2000-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990826

1999-10-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990826

1997-08-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970416

1997-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE ES FR GB IT SE