Global Patent Index - EP 0788755 B1

EP 0788755 B1 2000-03-01 - Bath- and showertub support

Title (en)

Bath- and showertub support

Title (de)

Wannenträger, insbesondere Badewannen- und Duschwannenträger

Title (fr)

Support pour baignoires et baignoires de douche

Publication

EP 0788755 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97101846 A

Priority

DE 29602386 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0788755A1] Foamed plastic tray of bath or shower is carried by a support with a peripheral side wall (1) around a sunken base (3) with a drain (5) at one corner, to which a drain pipe may be attached. Installation and/or inspection aperture is provided in the side wall of the support in the region of the drain, being closed by a separate closure member (6). Preferably the closure member is positively attached to the support by being pushed into the aperture from below like a slide valve. The closure member and the side wall may form a key and slot joint and the contour of the inspection aperture and that of the closure member at the side facing the drain may be smaller than at the outside of the side wall.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 3/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/16 (2006.01); A47K 3/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/40 (2013.01); A47K 3/1605 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29602386 U1 19960425; EP 0788755 A1 19970813; EP 0788755 B1 20000301; PL 182733 B1 20020228; PL 318410 A1 19970818

INPADOC legal status


2009-02-27 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080228

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080902

2008-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ALPHA-SAN G.M.B.H. SANITARTECHNIK

- Effective date: 20080228

2007-03-01 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070301

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-02-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070220

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-12-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-11-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050901

2005-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050901

2004-02-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040217

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-02-16 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040216

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701157 20000406

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR NL

1999-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990401

1999-01-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALPHA-SAN GMBH SANITAERTECHNIK

1997-12-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971002

1997-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR NL