Global Patent Index - EP 0788761 B1

EP 0788761 B1 2000-05-17 - An apparatus for processing a base with a rotating member

Title (en)

An apparatus for processing a base with a rotating member

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Bearbeiten einer Fläche mit einem rotierenden Element

Title (fr)

Appareil pour traiter une surface au moyen d'un organe rotatif

Publication

EP 0788761 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96203638 A

Priority

  • EP 96203638 A
  • EP 96200289 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0788761A1] An apparatus (1) for processing a base with the aid of a rotating member (6), such as brushing or rubbing a floor, comprising: a frame or chassis (2); coupling means (15) disposed on the chassis (2) and for coupling the rotating member to the chassis (2); driving means (7-12) displaced in the chassis (2) and for driving the rotating member (6); and varying means (20) for varying the magnitude and position of the pressing force of the rotating member (6) relative to the base. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 11/162; A47L 11/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 11/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 11/4038 (2013.01); A47L 11/16 (2013.01); A47L 11/4058 (2013.01); A47L 11/4069 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK ES FR GB LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0788761 A1 19970813; EP 0788761 B1 20000517

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081220

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2010-03-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20081220

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081219

2009-11-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-10-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090831

2009-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081219

2009-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071217

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080131

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071227

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-02-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20071228

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20071226

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20071223

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: JOHNSONDIVERSEY, INC.

- Free text: JOHNSONDIVERSEY, INC.#8310 16TH STREET#STURTEVANT (WI 53177-0902) (US) -TRANSFER TO- JOHNSONDIVERSEY, INC.#8310 16TH STREET#STURTEVANT (WI 53177-0902) (US)

2003-03-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-02-12 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-12-13 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: UNILEVER N.V. TRANSFER- JOHNSONDIVERSEY, INC.

2002-12-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: JOHNSONDIVERSEY, INC.

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147896 T3

2000-08-17 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-08-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69608408 20000621

2000-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB LI NL SE

1999-02-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981222

1997-10-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970903

1997-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB LI NL SE