Global Patent Index - EP 0788815 B1

EP 0788815 B1 2000-05-31 - Pressure handle valve for permanently presurized fire extinguisher

Title (en)

Pressure handle valve for permanently presurized fire extinguisher

Title (de)

Druckhebel-Ventil für Dauerdruck-Feuerlöscher

Title (fr)

Levier de pression avec soupape pour extincteur d'incendie sous pression permanente

Publication

EP 0788815 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97101877 A

Priority

DE 29602248 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0788815A2] The valve is fitted to a fire extinguisher which is maintained in a pressurised state, and has a metal body (10) which is made preferably from brass, and which can be screwed onto the feed pipe on a tank which holds an extinguishing agent. A valve bore (20) passes through the body, and is aligned axially with the feed pipe. A manometer and a testing nozzle (40) are connected to the inside of the tank by pressure bores. The manometer is set into a nozzle (30) which is made in one piece with the valve body.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62C 13/64; A62C 13/72

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62C 13/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62C 13/64 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT LU SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29602248 U1 19960411; AT 193458 T 20000615; EP 0788815 A2 19970813; EP 0788815 A3 19980520; EP 0788815 B1 20000531; EP 0788815 B2 20030924; ES 2148850 T3 20001016; ES 2148850 T5 20040616

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110901

2013-05-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110206

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110207

2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110207

2012-04-11 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120411

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110206

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2012-01-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59701789

- Effective date: 20110901

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110206

2011-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-11-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110206

2011-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110206

2011-11-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111102

2011-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110206

2011-10-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GNUTTI CIRILLO S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20110228

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100216

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100315

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100128

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100211

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100222

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20100202

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100317

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100127

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100209

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-04-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20100209

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-07-16 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2004-06-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2004-01-28 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031231

2004-01-20 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

2003-09-24 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20030924

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT LU SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-11-29 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CPF INDUSTRIALE S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2148850 T3

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701789 20000706

2000-06-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-06-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. A. GIAMBROCONO & C. S.R.L.

2000-06-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: GNUTTI CIRILLO S.P.A.

2000-06-14 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Free text: HOFER, DANIEL

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT LU SE

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193458 T 20000615

1998-12-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981109

1998-07-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980508

1998-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT LU SE

1998-05-20 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A62C 13/64

1997-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT LU SE