Global Patent Index - EP 0788877 B1

EP 0788877 B1 2000-08-16 - Ink rail device

Title (en)

Ink rail device

Title (de)

Kammerrakel

Title (fr)

Chambre de racle

Publication

EP 0788877 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97101603 A

Priority

DE 29602257 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2197169C] A hollow wiper, also called a chamber doctor, for inking a cylinder in a printing machine, which cylinder has depressions for receiving ink. The chamber doctor includes a chamber doctor body, at least one doctor blade, and lateral side parts, the chamber doctor body, the at least one doctor blade and the side parts being arranged to define an ink chamber that is open toward the cylinder. The doctor blade is movably supported at the chamber doctor body. The doctor blade is movable relative to the chamber doctor body so that the doctor blade is automatically readjusted to compensate for wear, and further so that parts of the doctor blade and chamber doctor body which come into contact with ink are movable away from one another.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 9/06; B41F 31/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/027 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29602257 U1 19960328; CA 2197169 A1 19970810; CA 2197169 C 20000404; EP 0788877 A1 19970813; EP 0788877 B1 20000816; US 6053102 A 20000425

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-09-30 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2003-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

2003-09-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030902

2003-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030204

2003-02-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030203

2002-02-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020207

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-02-07 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020207

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-02-04 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020204

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-17 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020117

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020115

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-12-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20001114

2000-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59702171

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-21

2000-09-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE

1998-12-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981116

1998-04-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980203

1997-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE