Global Patent Index - EP 0788879 B1

EP 0788879 B1 2000-03-22 - Rotary printing press

Title (en)

Rotary printing press

Title (de)

Rotationsdruckmachine

Title (fr)

Machine d'impression rotative

Publication

EP 0788879 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97101657 A

Priority

CH 33496 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0788879A1] The rotary printing machine has the printing cylinders (16) at each printing station (1,2,3) directly driven by a vectorial asynchronous motor (26) controlled by an electronic circuit (101) regulating angular position. The set angular position is delivered over time from a central synchronisation controller. The assembly of cylinder, shaft and rotor is mobile in axial translation, to allow correction of lateral position of the printing plates or the cylinder. Reference marks printed by each station are monitored to determine the misalignment. Errors are corrected by an adjuster mechanism (35) driven by an electric motor (25). An angle encoder on each shaft provides rotational position information.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/14; B41F 13/00; B41F 13/008

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/12 (2006.01); B41F 13/00 (2006.01); B41F 13/008 (2006.01); B41F 13/14 (2006.01); B41F 33/08 (2006.01); B41F 33/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/00 (2013.01); B41F 13/008 (2013.01); B41F 13/14 (2013.01); B41P 2213/734 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0788879 A1 19970813; EP 0788879 B1 20000322; AU 1254897 A 19970814; AU 712423 B2 19991104; BR 9700918 A 19980901; CA 2197036 A1 19970810; CA 2197036 C 20010227; CH 691225 A5 20010531; CH 691225 A8 20010815; CN 1079049 C 20020213; CN 1159982 A 19970924; DE 69701481 D1 20000427; DE 69701481 T2 20000810; JP 2866071 B2 19990308; JP H09216348 A 19970819; KR 100220262 B1 19990915; TW 425351 B 20010311; US 5771805 A 19980630

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-04 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69701481

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160211

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080204

2008-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080204

2007-01-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070122

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000613

2000-06-02 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO INGG. FISCHETTI & WEBER

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69701481 20000427

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-06-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980504

1997-08-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970204

1997-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT