Global Patent Index - EP 0788881 B1

EP 0788881 B1 2001-04-04 - Clamping and pulling device for sleeves for cylinders in printing machines

Title (en)

Clamping and pulling device for sleeves for cylinders in printing machines

Title (de)

Klemm- und Ziehvorrichtung für Auszüge von Zylindern in Druckmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de serrage et de traction pour les manchons des cylindres dans les machines d'impression

Publication

EP 0788881 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96120587 A

Priority

DE 19602104 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0788881A1] Gripper elements (7) are positioned in a duct (1) running axially over the periphery of the cylinder (2). The gripper elements pick up and hold one end of the dressing (3) extending round one duct edge (1a) into the duct. The gripper elements gripping the edge of the cylinder dressing move into the duct when power-driven and pull the cylinder dressing round the duct's edge. The gripper elements may consist of at least one clamping lug (7) movable in the tensioning direction and one fixed jaw surface (10) of an abutment on the cylinder. Two clamping lugs (7.1,7.2) may face the clamping jaw (10.1,10.2) and may each support an abutment (9) on the cylinder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 21/10; B41F 30/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 27/12 (2006.01); B41F 21/10 (2006.01); B41F 30/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/10 (2013.01); B41F 30/00 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19602104 A1 19970724; DE 19602104 C2 20000914; EP 0788881 A1 19970813; EP 0788881 B1 20010404; JP 4144914 B2 20080903; JP H09193350 A 19970729; KR 100230467 B1 19991115; US 5718174 A 19980217

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071220

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081020

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-12-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061212

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060701

2006-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051220

2006-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2005-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051220

2004-12-17 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20041217

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-12-17 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20041217

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-11-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041122

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-06-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010510

2001-04-12 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH FR GB IT LI NL

1999-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990430

1997-08-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961220

1997-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH FR GB IT LI NL