Global patent index - EP 0788974 B1

EP 0788974 B1 2000-05-24 - Bag, obtained from a sheet and a plastic net, for containing loose products, particularly fruit and vegetable products

Title (en)

Bag, obtained from a sheet and a plastic net, for containing loose products, particularly fruit and vegetable products

Title (de)

Aus einem Blatt und einem Kunststoffnetz gewonnener Beutel, zum Enthalten von losen Produkten, insgesondere Frucht- bzw. Gemüseprodukten

Title (fr)

Sachet, obtenu à partir d'une feuille et d'un filet en plastique, pour contenir des produits en vrac, en particulier des fruits et légumes

Publication

EP 0788974 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97101632 A

Priority

IT BO960017 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0788974A2] A bag for containing loose products, particularly fruit and vegetable products, comprising a pouch (2) composed of a net (3), which forms one side of the pouch (2), and of a plastic sheet (4), which forms another side of the pouch (2), the net (3) and the sheet (4) being joined to each other so as to close the pouch (2) to form the bottom at a lower end thereof and a handle for carrying the pouch at the upper end thereof. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 30/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 30/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 29/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0788974 A2 19970813; EP 0788974 A3 19980401; EP 0788974 B1 20000524; DE 69702081 D1 20000629; DE 69702081 T2 20010201; ES 2148847 T3 20001016; GB 2309956 A 19970813; GB 2309956 B 20000112; GB 9624046 D0 19970108; IT 242331 Y1 20010614; IT BO960017 U1 19970807

INPADOC legal status

2003-06-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

- Effective date: 20011104

2002-06-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

2002-04-03 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20011104

2001-06-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: NNZ INDUSTRIELLE VERPACKUNGEN GMBH

2001-06-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: SACLARK S.R.L / JARSAN BEHEER MIJ. B.V.

2001-04-18 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: NNZ INDUSTRIELLE VERPACKUNGEN GMBH

- Effective date: 20000904

2001-04-18 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: SACLARK S.R.L / JARSAN BEHEER MIJ. B.V.

- Effective date: 20010221

2001-03-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010329

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010228

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-02-21 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010221

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-02-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010213

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-02-07 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010207

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-01-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: NNZ INDUSTRIELLE VERPACKUNGEN GMBH

2000-11-08 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: NNZ INDUSTRIELLE VERPACKUNGEN GMBH

- Effective date: 20000904

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2148847

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69702081

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-29

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR NL

1998-12-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981014

1998-11-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980916

1998-04-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR NL

1997-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR NL