Global patent index - EP 0789082 B1

EP 0789082 B1 2000-11-15 - Method for coating leather

Title (en)

Method for coating leather

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Beschichten von Leder

Title (fr)

Procédé de revêtement du cuir

Publication

EP 0789082 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96306523 A

Priority

US 384695 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0789082A1] An aqueous leather coating composition and a method for coating leather with the aqueous coating composition containing a multi-stage emulsion polymer which has been contacted with a transition metal oxide, hydroxide, or carbonate is provided. The leather coating fulfills desirable protective and aesthetic functions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C14C 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C14C 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C14C 11/003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0789082 A1 19970813; EP 0789082 B1 20001115; AU 6440596 A 19970320; AU 717402 B2 20000323; BR 9603767 A 19980602; CN 1062043 C 20010214; CN 1148115 A 19970423; DE 69610974 D1 20001221; DE 69610974 T2 20010329; ES 2151996 T3 20010116

INPADOC legal status

2016-09-09 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69610974

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150925

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150810

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150902

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120401

2012-04-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20120401

2011-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100910

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-05-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20010909

2001-11-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-09-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010909

2001-04-13 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2151996

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-12-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69610974

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-12-21

2000-11-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL

2000-03-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980402

1998-05-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980402

1997-08-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960919

1997-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL