Global Patent Index - EP 0789097 B1

EP 0789097 B1 2000-07-12 - Method and apparatus for measuring warp tension in a weaving loom

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for measuring warp tension in a weaving loom

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Messen der Spannung der Webkette in einer Webmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour mesurer la tension de la chaîne dans un métier à tisser

Publication

EP 0789097 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96810074 A

Priority

EP 96810074 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0789097A1] A method of measuring warp tension in a loom entails leading the warp over a deflecting agent and a spring loaded tensioner which is caused to swivel about a pivot by warp action. A force sensor is attached to the tensioner to measure the force, F(M), transferred to it. This force is essentially the same over the swivel arc depending on the run of the warp and the geometrical arrangement of the deflecting agent, tensioner and pivot point. Also claimed are: (i) the apparatus for implementing the method comprising the deflecting agent (3), tensioner (15), pivot (16) and force sensor (25) which has a surface which deflects under pressure and at least one measuring element fixed to the face, wherein the force sensor and tensioner are so located to one another that the normal to the pressure-receiving surface and line of action of the force F(M) point in the same direction; and (ii) a loom using the apparatus which is then followed by a warp beam.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 49/04; D03D 49/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 59/40 (2006.01); D03D 49/04 (2006.01); D03D 49/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 49/18 (2013.01); D03D 49/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0789097 A1 19970813; EP 0789097 B1 20000712; DE 59605592 D1 20000817; JP H09241947 A 19970916; US 5827975 A 19981027

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110901

2012-01-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59605592

- Effective date: 20110901

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110205

2011-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SULZER TEXTIL A.G.

- Effective date: 20110228

2010-10-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100401

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100219

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100115

- Year of fee payment: 15

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-08 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-09-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605592 20000817

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

2000-07-05 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

1999-12-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SULZER TEXTIL AG

1998-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980324

1998-03-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980115

1997-11-05 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

1997-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

1997-08-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT;SI