Global Patent Index - EP 0789110 B1

EP 0789110 B1 2001-04-11 - Suspension device for civil engineering structures and building method

Title (en)

Suspension device for civil engineering structures and building method

Title (de)

Aufhängevorrichtung für Bauwerke und Verfahren zum Herstellen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de suspension pour ouvrage de génie civil et procédé de construction

Publication

EP 0789110 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97400238 A

Priority

FR 9601405 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0789110A1] The suspension cable (1), for civil engineering, has an intermediate sheet (11) between the strands, which is corrugated alternately on both sides. The parallel corrugation peaks (12) are triangular with curved faces, to fit into the gaps (T) between the strands (7). Also claimed is production of the sheet, using extrusion. Preferably each strand (7) is covered (9) by a supple material of the same material as the intermediate sheet (11), preferably of high density polyethylene or a polyolefin. The sheet material, between the corrugations, has a thickness of 0.1 mm.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01D 19/16; D07B 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01D 1/00 (2006.01); D07B 1/16 (2006.01); E01D 11/00 (2006.01); E01D 19/16 (2006.01); E01D 101/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01D 19/16 (2013.01); D07B 1/167 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0789110 A1 19970813; EP 0789110 B1 20010411; AR 005623 A1 19990623; AT 200533 T 20010415; AU 1254597 A 19970814; AU 709875 B2 19990909; BR 9700896 A 19981208; DE 69704506 D1 20010517; DE 69704506 T2 20020328; DK 0789110 T3 20010813; ES 2156343 T3 20010616; FR 2744467 A1 19970808; FR 2744467 B1 19980403; GR 3035955 T3 20010831; JP H09310307 A 19971202; NO 970304 A 19970807; NO 970304 D0 19970124; PT 789110 E 20010928

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050203

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030204

2003-11-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-09-30 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-09-29 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2003-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-09-04 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-09-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030902

2003-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-28 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-04 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030204

2003-02-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030204

2003-02-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030203

2002-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-04-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-08 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020308

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-02-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020213

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-02-04 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20020204

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20020131

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020129

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020122

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-21 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20020121

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-18 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020118

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-17 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020117

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010703

2001-08-13 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-07-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010615

2001-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2156343 T3

2001-05-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2001-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69704506 20010517

2001-04-12 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-04-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200533 T 20010415

2000-03-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-01-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FREYSSINET INTERNATIONAL STUP

1997-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970905

1997-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES GB GR IT LI NL PT SE