Global Patent Index - EP 0789124 B1

EP 0789124 B1 2000-08-30 - Hinge assembly for doors, windows and the like

Title (en)

Hinge assembly for doors, windows and the like

Title (de)

Bandanordnung für Türen, Fenster und dergleichen

Title (fr)

Charnière pour portes, fenêtres et similaires

Publication

EP 0789124 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97100993 A

Priority

DE 29602084 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0789124A2] The arrangement involves a frame band part (32) fixed to the frame (10) and a panel or pane band part fixed to the panel or pane (20) located pivotably in relation to each other. The bands (30) with the panel or pane closed are arranged invisibly from the opening side in the interior of the fixed frame and the panel or pane. The panel or pane band part is pivotable round a hinge axis located in the interior of the fixed frame near its front wall (2). The frame band part has a cross-section vertical to the hinge axis fitting in a chamber (4) of the fixed frame. The frame band part is fixed by means of screws (46) to at least one (6) of the walls (6,7) of the chamber running vertically to the frame plane.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 5/02; E05D 5/06; E05D 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/02 (2006.01); E05D 5/06 (2006.01); E05D 7/04 (2006.01); E05D 5/12 (2006.01); E05D 7/10 (2006.01); E05D 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/04 (2013.01); E05D 5/023 (2013.01); E05D 5/06 (2013.01); E05D 5/128 (2013.01); E05D 7/1005 (2013.01); E05D 7/12 (2013.01); E05D 2005/067 (2013.01); E05D 2007/1038 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/41 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/63 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/148 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29602084 U1 19970605; AT 195994 T 20000915; EP 0789124 A2 19970813; EP 0789124 A3 19970820; EP 0789124 B1 20000830

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110802

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100124

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110123

2011-12-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59702260

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110123

2011-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HAHN G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20110131

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100801

2010-10-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100930

2010-10-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-08-18 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100801

2010-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100113

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100125

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100131

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100119

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090113

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090108

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090104

- Year of fee payment: 13

2001-08-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702260 20001005

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR IT NL SE

2000-08-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 195994 T 20000915

2000-08-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2000-03-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000208

1998-04-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980206

1997-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR IT NL SE

1997-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR IT NL SE