Global patent index - EP 0789125 B1

EP 0789125 B1 2000-05-03 - Supporting member for a closure element, preferably for a wing of a sliding and folding door

Title (en)

Supporting member for a closure element, preferably for a wing of a sliding and folding door

Title (de)

Tragteil für ein Verschlusselement, vorzugsweise für einen Türflügel einer Faltschiebetür

Title (fr)

Pièce porteuse pour élément de fermeture, de préférence pour vantail de porte pliante et coulissante

Publication

EP 0789125 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97100548 A

Priority

DE 29602424 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: JPH09235935A] PROBLEM TO BE SOLVED: To provide a support device that is easily engaged in a guide groove even in the case where a door leaf on one side of a folding door is connected to the door main body. SOLUTION: A carriage part 6 having a hammer-shaped head 24 suitable for being fitted to the central area of a C-shaped guide groove is provided and fixed with a pin 25 having a square shaft 27 for fitting to a square hole of the head so that the head can be turned round an axis intersecting the guide groove at a right angle. The width of the head 24 is smaller than the width of a slot of the guide groove while the length of the head 24 is bigger than the width of the slot. A rise part 14 for housing the head is inset into the guide groove, and the head is fitted to a step part at the inside of the guide groove by turning the pin at an angle of 90 deg. with a right-angled part 30 of the pin.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 15/26; E05D 15/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/06 (2006.01); E05D 15/26 (2006.01); E06B 3/48 (2006.01); E05D 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/482 (2013.01); E05D 15/264 (2013.01); E05D 5/08 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/64 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/528 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/60 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/20 (2013.01); Y10T 16/35 (2013.01); Y10T 16/37 (2013.01); Y10T 16/376 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29602424 U1 19960328; AT 192539 T 20000515; BR 9700929 A 19981208; EP 0789125 A1 19970813; EP 0789125 B1 20000503; ES 2146040 T3 20000716; JP 3043289 B2 20000522; JP H09235935 A 19970909; US 5920956 A 19990713

INPADOC legal status

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090115

2010-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090116

2010-03-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20090116

2009-10-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090115

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2008-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080111

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080130

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080122

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080122

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070629

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070129

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-01-15 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070115

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-12-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061228

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-09-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2146040

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701542

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-08

2000-05-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: UFFICIO BREVETTI RAPISARDI S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

2000-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 192539

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990601

1997-08-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970623

1997-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT