Global Patent Index - EP 0789129 B1

EP 0789129 B1 2002-11-13 - Self-propelled boring ram

Title (en)

Self-propelled boring ram

Title (de)

Selbstgetriebenes Rammbohrgerät

Title (fr)

Mouton de forage autopropulsé

Publication

EP 0789129 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96113139 A

Priority

DE 19530972 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19530972A1] This automatic pile driver is sued to drive boreholes and has an impact piston (4) moving axially up and down, with a working volume (5) into which a guide tube (8) enters, the tube being fixed to the casing. The volume has radial control ports (3), whilst further radial control ports (13) penetrate the guide tube. A control sleeve (15,27) is guided in an annulus (11) of the guide tube. The guide tube (8) is formed by an inner- (9) and an outer tube (10). The inner tube (9) and the control sleeve have corresponding limit stops (22,23). The inner tube (9), the outer tube (10) and the control sleeve (15,27) have groups of radial control ports (13,14,17) coming into mutual correspondence during the forward or reverse strokes. The control sleeve is spring loaded (16). In the advancing position, the following are opened: a channel (20), allowing control air into the control sleeve (15) pressure chamber (19); and the inner tube (9) control port (13), into the control sleeve (15) chamber (18). The annulus (11) and the working volume (5) of the impact piston are connected by an axial hole (12). Controlling air and the compression spring (23) work in the same direction. In the annulus (11) ahead of the control sleeve (27) a control air channel (25,26) discharges into a pressure chamber (35). In an alternative arrangement, the control air and the compression spring (23) work in opposite directions. The outer tube has at least one externally-turned recess (24,40). The control sleeve (27) may be advanced and retracted without spring loading pressure chamber (18,34; 19,35) causing back and forth action.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 4/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 4/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 4/145 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19530972 A1 19970227; DE 19530972 C2 19991202; AT 227803 T 20021115; EP 0789129 A2 19970813; EP 0789129 A3 19990714; EP 0789129 B1 20021113; JP H09165986 A 19970624; US 5960892 A 19991005

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150816

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150816

2016-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59609869

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140821

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140922

- Year of fee payment: 19

2004-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-02-29 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TRACTO-TECHNICK G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-08-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030816

2003-04-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030307

2003-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-02-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030213

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59609869 20021219

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-13 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227803 T 20021115

2002-10-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRACTO-TECHNICK GMBH

2000-05-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000330

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000114

1999-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

1997-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE