Global patent index - EP 0789133 B1

EP 0789133 B1 2000-03-01 - Support disc with stiffening element for the labyrinth seal of a turbo machine rotor

Title (en)

Support disc with stiffening element for the labyrinth seal of a turbo machine rotor

Title (de)

Labyrinthträgerscheibe mit einer eingebauten Versteifung für Turbomaschinenrotor

Title (fr)

Disque labyrinthe avec raidisseur incorpore pour rotor de turbomachine

Publication

EP 0789133 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97400211 A

Priority

FR 9601527 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0789133A1] The labyrinth seal disc (12) consists of a main rim (13) incorporating labyrinth seals (10). An arched section (14) presses against the forward surface (19) of the rotor disc (8). Fixing bolts (6) are located between the two discs. The seal disc incorporates a main radial stiffener (23) just inside the labyrinth seal. The arched section of the disc is formed in the upper part of the rim (13), is elongated in a radial direction and slightly convex. The rear edge (22) of the disc is on a level with the rear portion of the stiffener. Additional fixings between the two discs are provided by teeth (24) on the back of the seal disc engaging with slots in the rotor disc. The arched section is reinforced by ribs (26) extending from the teeth.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 11/00; F01D 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/06 (2006.01); F01D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 11/001 (2013.01); F01D 5/066 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0789133 A1 19970813; EP 0789133 B1 20000301; CA 2196642 A1 19970809; CA 2196642 C 20051115; DE 69701332 D1 20000406; DE 69701332 T2 20000727; FR 2744761 A1 19970814; FR 2744761 B1 19980313; US 5816776 A 19981006

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160130

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160802

2016-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20160130

2016-08-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69701332

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160111

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141218

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-06-13 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120517 AND 20120523

2006-02-10 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2002-01-25 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2002-01-25 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-10-20 [EN4] FR: NOTIFICATION OF NON FILING TRANSLATION IN AN EARLIER BOPI IS ERRONEOUS

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN4

2000-07-28 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69701332

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-06

2000-03-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990428

1997-08-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970217

1997-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB