Global patent index - EP 0789138 B1

EP 0789138 B1 2000-04-05 - Two stroke engine having a control means for the valve movement

Title (en)

Two stroke engine having a control means for the valve movement

Title (de)

Zweitaktbrennkraftmaschine mit Ventilbewegungssteuerungsmitteln

Title (fr)

Moteur deux temps ayant un moyen de contrôle du mouvement de la soupape

Publication

EP 0789138 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97400225 A

Priority

FR 9602048 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0789138A1] The engine consists of at least one cylinder (111) containing a reciprocating piston (112). One end of the piston is connected to a crankcase pump (115) containing the engine's crankshaft (114). A pressure pipe (87) has one end connected to the crankcase-pump and the other to the combustion chamber (113), controlled by a valve (86). The valve is actuated by a membrane unit (82) in which a supple membrane (89) separates first and second chambers (95a,95b) and is connected to the valve stem. The engine has a connecting pipe (92) between the second membrane chamber (95b) and the cylinder (111). This pipe is designed to delay the opening of the valve by controlling the pressure in the chamber. It has a second connecting pipe between the first chamber (95a) and the cylinder which is longer than the first connecting pipe and linked to it by a branch.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02B 25/26; F02B 33/04; F02M 69/08; F02M 69/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 33/44 (2006.01); F01L 9/02 (2006.01); F02B 25/16 (2006.01); F02B 25/26 (2006.01); F02B 29/06 (2006.01); F02B 33/04 (2006.01); F02D 13/02 (2006.01); F02D 23/00 (2006.01); F02M 69/08 (2006.01); F02M 69/10 (2006.01); F16K 31/365 (2006.01); F02B 75/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02B 25/26 (2013.01); F01L 9/026 (2013.01); F02B 33/04 (2013.01); F02M 69/08 (2013.01); F02M 69/10 (2013.01); F02B 2075/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0789138 A1 19970813; EP 0789138 B1 20000405; AT 191541 T 20000415; CN 1083932 C 20020501; CN 1165241 A 19971119; DE 69701585 D1 20000511; DE 69701585 T2 20010111; FR 2744764 A1 19970814; FR 2744764 B1 19980417; JP H09228847 A 19970902; US 5752477 A 19980519

INPADOC legal status

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070613

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20040801

2004-09-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-08-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040803

2004-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040801

2004-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU *PETROLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2003-02-06 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030206

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-05 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030205

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030131

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-01-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030127

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-01-20 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030120

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-12-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021224

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69701585

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-11

2000-04-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-04-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE GB IT LI NL

2000-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 191541

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-03-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MARIETTI E GISLON S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1999-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990322

1998-04-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980213

1997-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE GB IT LI NL