Global Patent Index - EP 0789141 B1

EP 0789141 B1 2001-05-30 - Intake air guide for an internal combustion engine of a vehicle

Title (en)

Intake air guide for an internal combustion engine of a vehicle

Title (de)

Ansaugluftführung für eine Brennkraftmaschine eines Kraftfahrzeuges

Title (fr)

Guidage d'air d'aspiration pour un moteur à combustion interne d'un véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 0789141 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96120227 A

Priority

  • DE 19604352 A
  • DE 19604353 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0789141A1] The induction air guide is fitted to an internal combustion engine on a motor vehicle, and has a space (4) which is especially in the shell (5) of an induction air filter, and in which the airflow is smoothed. A rotating flap (8) is arranged in one wall (9) of the space, and is usually held in its closed position. Two wings (8a,8b) are formed in the flap by its axis (12) of rotation, and one wing (8a) opens outwards and collects foreign matter, which is especially water. The other wing (8b) swings inwards and may have a separating wall (17), in order to prevent foreign matter from accumulating.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 35/024; F02M 35/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/10013 (2013.01); F02M 35/161 (2013.01); F02M 35/02 (2013.01); F05C 2225/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0789141 A1 19970813; EP 0789141 B1 20010530; DE 19604353 A1 19971023

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120102

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111217

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111217

2012-09-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120831

2012-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111217

2011-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-11-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59607003

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110119

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101230

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101230

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100204

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-07-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59607003 20010705

2001-06-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-06-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000428

1997-08-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970610

1997-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT