Global Patent Index - EP 0789312 B1

EP 0789312 B1 2002-09-25 - Method of compensating offset voltage caused in analog arithmetic unit and analog arithmetic unit

Title (en)

Method of compensating offset voltage caused in analog arithmetic unit and analog arithmetic unit

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Kompensation der in analoger Recheneinheit verursachten Offsetspannung und analoge Recheneinheit

Title (fr)

Procédé de compensation de tension de décalage provoqueé dans une unité arithmétique analogique et unité arithmétique analogique

Publication

EP 0789312 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97300828 A

Priority

JP 2277996 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0789312A1] An analog arithmetic unit furnished with an input capacitor, an amplifier, a floating gate MOS. An input voltage is given to the amplifier through the input capacitor. The amplifier is composed of a CMOS inverter or the like and has a floating gate in a node at its input end. The floating gate MOS controls an amount of charges in the above node by injecting the hot electrons or absorbing the charges through the tunnel effect. Accordingly, it has become possible to maintain an amount of charges at the above node at a constant level over a long period. Thus, a frequency at which an offset voltage caused by charges accumulated at the above floating gate and causing an operation error can be reduced, thereby increasing an overall arithmetic operation. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06G 7/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06G 7/12 (2006.01); H03F 3/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06G 7/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0789312 A1 19970813; EP 0789312 B1 20020925; DE 69715696 D1 20021031; DE 69715696 T2 20030410; JP 3325760 B2 20020917; JP H09218909 A 19970819

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050206

2005-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050901

2005-02-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050207

2004-02-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040226

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-02-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040223

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-02-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040204

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-04-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715696 20021031

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-02-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011227

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971111

1997-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB