Global patent index - EP 0789373 B1

EP 0789373 B1 2000-06-07 - Electric switch

Title (en)

Electric switch

Title (de)

Electrischer Schalter

Title (fr)

Interrupteur électrique

Publication

EP 0789373 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97300686 A

Priority

GB 9602320 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0789373A1] A snap-action electric switch includes a housing (2) containing a snap-action mechanism (16) movable by a plunger (22) between a rest position and a displaced position, the snap-action mechanism (16) comprising a thin leaf spring with three parallel legs (28,30,32) the integral one ends of which constitute a contact member, at least one of said legs (28) being longitudinally stressed such that, on movement of the unstressed leg or legs (30,32) beyond an overcentre position by the plunger (22), the contact member snaps from its rest position to its displaced position. The other end of the or each unstressed leg (30,32) is mounted to be movable with the plunger (22) whereby, on guided linear movement of the plunger (22) within the housing (2), the other end of the or each unstressed leg (30,32) is moved bodily with the plunger (22) to achieve said overcentre position of said unstressed leg or legs (30,32). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 13/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/36 (2013.01); H01H 2011/0081 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0789373 A1 19970813; EP 0789373 B1 20000607; DE 69702216 D1 20000713; DE 69702216 T2 20010301; GB 9602320 D0 19960403

INPADOC legal status

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090204

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090302

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090204

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20091030

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090204

2009-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051220

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080225

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080301

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080225

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080229

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080225

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070222

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070529

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-02-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070226

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-02-22 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070222

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-02-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070220

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-12-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051220

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-09-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-09-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-07-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69702216

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-13

2000-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-07-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990526

1997-10-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970903

1997-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI