Global Patent Index - EP 0789419 B1

EP 0789419 B1 2001-12-12 - Device and method for transmission of information for systems with radiating waveguides

Title (en)

Device and method for transmission of information for systems with radiating waveguides

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Übertragung von Informationen für Systeme mit strahlenden Wellenleitern

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé de transmission d'informations pour système à guide d'ondes rayonnant

Publication

EP 0789419 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97400236 A

Priority

FR 9601620 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0789419A1] The device includes a cavity resonator (1) which lies on one side of the waveguide (2) and is short-circuited at its ends. The resonator resonates in a fundamental TE011 mode. The coupler comprises holes in the guide and the cavity and the resonant slot, lying at right angles to the slots in the waveguide, is directed from the large surface of the cavity towards the mobile unit. A Schottky diode, acting as a modulator (7), is positioned between the edges of the resonant slot and a point of high impedance at the required frequency. A device within the cavity generates the information signal to the diode which may short-circuit the slot depending on the signal polarity.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/32; B61L 3/22; B61L 25/02; H01Q 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/052 (2006.01); B61L 3/22 (2006.01); B61L 25/02 (2006.01); G01S 1/68 (2006.01); H01Q 1/32 (2006.01); H01Q 13/10 (2006.01); H01Q 21/00 (2006.01); H04B 3/60 (2006.01); H04B 7/04 (2017.01); H04B 7/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61L 25/021 (2013.01); B61L 3/227 (2013.01); B61L 25/023 (2013.01); H01Q 1/3233 (2013.01); H01Q 21/0043 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0789419 A1 19970813; EP 0789419 B1 20011212; AT 210898 T 20011215; AU 1250097 A 19970814; AU 709313 B2 19990826; BG 101191 A 19970930; BG 62868 B1 20000929; BR 9700897 A 19990112; CA 2197110 A1 19970810; CA 2197110 C 20030805; CN 1096754 C 20021218; CN 1164779 A 19971112; CZ 290348 B6 20020717; CZ 9700380 A3 19970813; DE 69708945 D1 20020124; DE 69708945 T2 20020801; DK 0789419 T3 20020408; ES 2167688 T3 20020516; FR 2744865 A1 19970814; FR 2744865 B1 19980320; HU 219939 B 20010928; HU 9700343 A2 19971229; HU 9700343 A3 20000529; HU 9700343 D0 19970328; IL 120157 A 19991028; IL 120157 D0 19970610; JP 3839118 B2 20061101; JP H09265597 A 19971007; KR 100451066 B1 20050113; PL 181409 B1 20010731; PL 318367 A1 19970818; PT 789419 E 20020531; RU 2168273 C2 20010527; SK 18397 A3 19990211; SK 284030 B6 20040803; US 6034646 A 20000307; ZA 9700974 B 19980416

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100204

2012-09-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100203

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100204

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110316

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100203

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100203

2011-03-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110329

2011-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2011-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2011-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100203

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2011-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100203

2010-11-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100203

2010-11-24 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101029

2010-10-29 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20100913

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100203

2010-10-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-10-04 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2010-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-09-15 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100901

2010-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *GEC ALSTHOM TRANSPORT

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-08-11 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090213

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090408

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090221

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090216

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090217

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-06-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20090226

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-05-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20090217

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090217

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-05-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20090123

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090218

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20090213

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-04-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20090220

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-04-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20090216

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-31 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020400929

2002-05-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020305

2002-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2167688 T3

2002-04-08 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69708945 20020124

2002-01-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-01-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011212

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: CABINET ROLAND NITHARDT CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDU

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19970206;LT PAYMENT 19970206;LV PAYMENT 19970206;RO PAYMENT 19970206;SI PAYMENT 19970206

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210898 T 20011215

2000-09-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000814

1998-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971206

1997-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1997-08-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 970206;LT PAYMENT 970206;LV PAYMENT 970206;RO PAYMENT 970206;SI PAYMENT 970206