Global patent index - EP 0789423 B1

EP 0789423 B1 2000-06-07 - Method of making an electrical connection by adhesion of a rigid terminal to a conductive track, a rigid terminal for carrying out this method and a heating plate comprising this terminal

Title (en)

Method of making an electrical connection by adhesion of a rigid terminal to a conductive track, a rigid terminal for carrying out this method and a heating plate comprising this terminal

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung einer elektrischen Verbindung durch Kleben eines starren Anschlusselements auf eine Leiterbahn, ein starres Anschlusselement zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens und eine dieses Anschlusselement tragende Heizplatte

Title (fr)

Procédé de réalisation d'une connexion électrique par collage d'une cosse rigide sur une piste conductrice, cosse rigide pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé et plaque chauffante comportant la cosse

Publication

EP 0789423 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97400268 A

Priority

  • FR 9601636 A
  • FR 9606997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0789423A1] A procedure consists of attaching a circular or rectangular plate with a space terminal (21) to the surface of an electrical component (10) such as a heating resistance, using an electrically conducting adhesive (4). The joint can incorporate copper strands (3) from an electrical cable, the strands having a diameter of 0.5-0.8 mm. The adhesive is in the form of a thermostable conducting resin, such as a silver-charged polyimide, which is dried and reticulated after the joint has been made.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/04; H01R 43/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/04 (2006.01); H01R 43/00 (2006.01); H05B 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/06 (2013.01); H01R 4/04 (2013.01); H01R 24/66 (2013.01); H01R 43/00 (2013.01); H01R 2101/00 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49147 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0789423 A1 19970813; EP 0789423 B1 20000607; CA 2197053 A1 19970810; CA 2197053 C 20060815; CN 1136761 C 20040128; CN 1166123 A 19971126; DE 69702218 D1 20000713; DE 69702218 T2 20010222; ES 2148913 T3 20001016; FR 2744843 A1 19970814; FR 2744843 B1 19980410; US 5928455 A 19990727

INPADOC legal status

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070206

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060201

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070207

2008-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20070207

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070206

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070901

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070901

2008-01-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *SEB

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-11-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20071030

2007-11-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20070901

2007-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070206

2006-03-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060317

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-02-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060227

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-02-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060224

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-02-05 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060205

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-02-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060202

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-02-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050202

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2148913

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-08-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-07-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69702218

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-13

2000-07-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000608

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

1999-10-20 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: METHOD OF MAKING AN ELECTRICAL CONNECTION BY ADHESION OF A RIGID TERMINAL TO A CONDUCTIVE TRACK, A RIGID TERMINAL FOR CARRYING OUT THIS METHOD AND A HEATING PLATE COMPRISING THIS TERMINAL

1998-08-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980713

1998-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971112

1997-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL