Global Patent Index - EP 0789434 B1

EP 0789434 B1 2000-07-05 - Method for influencing the extinctive capacity of follow-up current of overvoltage arresters and overvoltage arresters using this method

Title (en)

Method for influencing the extinctive capacity of follow-up current of overvoltage arresters and overvoltage arresters using this method

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Beeinflussung des Folgestromlöschvermögens von Funkenstreckenanordnungen und Funkenstreckenanordnungen hierfür

Title (fr)

Méthode pour influencer la capacité d'extinction de courant de suivi pour dispositifs parafoudres et dispositifs parafoudre utilisant cette méthode

Publication

EP 0789434 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96118511 A

Priority

DE 19604947 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0789434A1] The control method is used for an overvoltage diverter device having a pair of spaced electrodes (2a,2b) contained within a housing (6) which contains an arc extinction gas, the volume of the interior (1) of the housing matched to the size of the arc current, to obtain a short-term increase in the internal pressure as a result of the arc current between the electrodes. The internal pressure may increase to between 10 and 60 bar, the overvoltage diverter device provided as a module inserted in an outer housing receiving one or more overvoltage diverter devices.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01T 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01T 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01T 1/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK FR IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19604947 C1 19970710; AT 194438 T 20000715; DE 19655119 C2 20010125; DK 0789434 T3 20001113; EP 0789434 A1 19970813; EP 0789434 B1 20000705

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091119

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100719

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091119

2010-08-25 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081120

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100127

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-10-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-07-14 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-07-06 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081111

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20081124

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20071030

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20071110

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-07-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2004-11-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20041123

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-07-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: J. PROEPSTER GMBH

- Effective date: 20010403

2001-07-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PHOENIX CONTACT GMBH & CO

- Effective date: 20010405

2001-05-23 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: J. PROEPSTER GMBH

- Effective date: 20010403

2000-11-13 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-09-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2000-08-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605543 20000810

2000-07-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-07-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR IT LI SE

2000-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194438 T 20000715

1998-12-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981113

1998-01-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZAHLMANN, PETER, DR.-ING.

1998-01-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KOENIG, RAIMUND

1998-01-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZEIDLER, MANFRED

1998-01-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WITTMANN, GEORG

1998-01-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DUSCHEK, WILLIBALD

1998-01-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HASSE, PETER

1997-08-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970614

1997-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR IT LI SE