Global patent index - EP 0789660 B1

EP 0789660 B1 2000-01-26 - TRANSPORT CONTAINER

Title (en)

TRANSPORT CONTAINER

Title (de)

TRANSPORTKASTEN

Title (fr)

CAISSE DE TRANSPORT

Publication

EP 0789660 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95900672 A

Priority

EP 9403633 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9614251A1] A plastic transport container (10) is intended for the simultaneous transport of a plurality of disc-like components (30), especially tin lids for the foodstuffs industry. The transport container has a base (11) and side walls (12) projecting therefrom and divisions inside the container for a plurality of storage compartments (13) for stacks of disc-like components arranged perpendicularly side-by-side. The storage compartments (13) are bordered on two sides by stack support devices (14) having apertures (15) for the insertion of gripping components to take the stacks into and out of the compartments.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 25/10; B65D 21/02; B65D 25/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/22 (2006.01); B65D 21/02 (2006.01); B65D 25/10 (2006.01); B65D 25/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 25/10 (2013.01); B65D 21/0213 (2013.01); B65D 25/205 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB IT NL PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9614251 A1 19960517; DE 59409113 D1 20000302; DK 0789660 T3 20000425; EP 0789660 A1 19970820; EP 0789660 B1 20000126; ES 2143031 T3 20000501; IS 4307 A 19960505; PT 789660 E 20000731

INPADOC legal status

2005-11-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051104

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20011214

2002-07-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020702

2001-09-28 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES;SEARCHED & EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010601

2001-07-30 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2001-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20001104

2001-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010601

2001-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20001122

- Year of fee payment: 07

2000-11-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001105

2000-11-04 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001104

2000-11-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001104

2000-07-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000418

2000-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2143031

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-04-25 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-04-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: UFFICIO BREVETTI RICCARDI & C.

2000-04-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000320

2000-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59409113

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000302

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT NL PT

2000-01-26 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000126

1999-01-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: IMPRESS METAL PACKAGING GMBH & CO. OHG

1998-10-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHMALBACH-LUBECA AG

1998-04-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980227

1997-08-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970410

1997-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT NL PT