Global patent index - EP 0790022 A3

EP 0790022 A3 2001-01-31 - Slide for drawers placed under the drawer bottom

Title (en)

Slide for drawers placed under the drawer bottom

Title (de)

Unterflur-Ausziehführung für Schubladen etc.

Title (fr)

Glissière pour tiroirs placée sous le fond du tiroir

Publication

EP 0790022 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 96116832 A

Priority

DE 19603334 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0790022A2] The cabinet has profiled guide rails (12), secured to its walls, which receive hollow profile runners (26) that are open on their bottom side and are secured to either the undersides of a drawer or to the drawer's sides close to its base. Rollers are held together in a frame inside the runners to allow them to move along the rails. The end section (30) of the runner next to the cabinet's back wall can swing round to lie parallel to it. Cooperating parts in the rails and runners ensure that the runners are swung round into a this position as they are pushed further into the cabinet. One end of a swing lever (32) is secured to the end of the guide rail next to the back wall, and this lever is used to swing the rail about an axis (a) parallel to the swing axis (A) of the runner. The opposite end of the lever has a slot (36) which receives a pin (34) which juts out from the end of the runner when the drawer has been pushed all the way in. Thus lets the lever be swung round so that the runner lies parallel to the back wall. The drawers then lie in a horizontal or vertical direction perpendicular to the direction in which they lie when pulled out.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 88/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/0462 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19603334 A1 19970807; EP 0790022 A2 19970820; EP 0790022 A3 20010131; US 5709443 A 19980120

INPADOC legal status

2002-11-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020503

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020305

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001221

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT ES GB IT

1997-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT ES GB IT