Global Patent Index - EP 0790031 B1

EP 0790031 B1 2000-03-01 - Vacuum cleaner

Title (en)

Vacuum cleaner

Title (de)

Staubsauger

Title (fr)

Aspirateur

Publication

EP 0790031 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96120464 A

Priority

  • DE 29600882 U
  • DE 19651028 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0790031A1] The appliance has a special housing portion (1) enclosing an airtight cavity (10) for insertion of a blower (2) consisting of a motor and fan wheel. The cavity is sealed with a preferably rubber cover (3) containing an air inlet (11). The blower is introduced through an opening (5) which is also sealed by the cover. The air escapes through a row of slots (4) shaped to accept a microfilter and provided with a separate cover (6). The same housing can enclose the on/off switch (8), control and/or display circuitry (9) and cable reel (12).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 5/22 (2006.01); A47L 9/00 (2006.01); A47L 9/10 (2006.01); A47L 9/22 (2006.01); A47L 9/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/122 (2013.01); A47L 5/22 (2013.01); A47L 9/00 (2013.01); A47L 9/22 (2013.01); A47L 9/32 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0790031 A1 19970820; EP 0790031 B1 20000301

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081219

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-10-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090831

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071214

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071220

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071220

- Year of fee payment: 12

2001-08-08 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20001219

2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001219

2000-06-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000525

2000-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604541 20000406

2000-04-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: PROPRIA S.R.L.

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-05-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980403

1998-03-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980126

1997-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT