Global patent index - EP 0790069 B1

EP 0790069 B1 2000-12-06 - Image display game apparatus

Title (en)

Image display game apparatus

Title (de)

Spielgerät mit Bildanzeige

Title (fr)

Dispositif de jeu affichant des images

Publication

EP 0790069 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97102597 A

Priority

JP 5365796 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0790069A2] An image display game apparatus has a display screen which displays randomly selected five cards with their faces up. Based on the player's evaluation of the cards, the player selectively presses a first group of push buttons to select unwanted cards and indicate replacement of the cards. When the player presses a push button in a second group, the selected unwanted cards are replaced with new cards. If the new combination of the cards achieves a prize-winning hand, then the player wins and is awarded a credit based on odds for the prize-winning hand. The player then pushes other push buttons in the second group to receive medals corresponding to the credit or proceed to a double-bet game. The push buttons in the second group are spaced from the first group of push buttons such that the push buttons in the second group and the push buttons in the first group cannot be pressed simultaneously by the same hand. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63F 1/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 5/04 (2006.01); A63F 1/18 (2006.01); A63F 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63F 1/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0790069 A2 19970820; EP 0790069 A3 19971008; EP 0790069 B1 20001206; AU 1478297 A 19970828; AU 719696 B2 20000518; DE 69703629 D1 20010111; DE 69703629 T2 20010802; JP H09220369 A 19970826

INPADOC legal status

2004-10-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040218

2004-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-02-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040218

2003-02-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030227

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030212

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-05-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-01-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69703629

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-01-11

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1999-06-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990510

1998-03-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980109

1997-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1997-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB