Global Patent Index - EP 0790084 B1

EP 0790084 B1 2001-12-19 - Winding device for bands

Title (en)

Winding device for bands

Title (de)

Haspelanlage für Bänder

Title (fr)

Bobinoir pour bandes

Publication

EP 0790084 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97101421 A

Priority

  • DE 19605293 A
  • DE 19620696 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0790084A2] The reel unit has an alternative drive for one of several reels for a continuous strip which can be cut into lengths by flying shears. There is at least one driver (5,13) after the shears, with rollers which can be adjusted so that the plane between the roller axes (6,7) can be turned from the vertical so that a normal standing on this plane is turned to face the first reel (9). The unit is arranged so that one reel is in the setting for being filled while the other is unwinding. The driver rollers may be able to move horizontally against the running direction of the strip.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 47/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 1/22 (2006.01); B21B 15/00 (2006.01); B21B 39/00 (2006.01); B21B 39/18 (2006.01); B21C 47/02 (2006.01); B21C 47/24 (2006.01); B21C 47/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 47/02 (2013.01); B21C 47/245 (2013.01); B21C 47/3441 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0790084 A2 19970820; EP 0790084 A3 19980429; EP 0790084 B1 20011219; AT 211032 T 20020115; CA 2197284 A1 19970815; CA 2197284 C 20070515; CN 1081495 C 20020327; CN 1161889 A 19971015; DE 59705828 D1 20020131; ES 2170291 T3 20020801; JP 3995295 B2 20071024; JP H09225529 A 19970902; MY 118434 A 20041130; US 5966978 A 19991019

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-27 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2006-04-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20051111

2006-02-01 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20051111

2006-02-01 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20051111

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-01-13 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20060113

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-01-13 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060113

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-01-12 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060112

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-02-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050223

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050120

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-18 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050118

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050111

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050106

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-01-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040122

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-12-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: BWG BERGWERK- UND WALZWERK-MASCHINENBAU GMBH

2002-10-23 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BWG BERGWERK- UND WALZWERK-MASCHINENBAU GMBH

- Effective date: 20020824

2002-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2170291 T3

2002-04-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020311

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705828 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

2001-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 211032 T 20020115

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

1999-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991116

1998-04-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

1997-08-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970213

1997-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE