Global Patent Index - EP 0790099 B1

EP 0790099 B1 2001-05-02 - Apparatus and method for grinding card cloth

Title (en)

Apparatus and method for grinding card cloth

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Schleifen von Garnituren

Title (fr)

Appareil et procédé pour meuler des garnitures de carde

Publication

EP 0790099 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97102526 A

Priority

DE 19605635 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0790099A1] The grinder grinds a fitting (84) pulled onto a carrier via a grinding element and a setting element (76,78,82) to press the grinding element against the fitting. The setting element has an elastically deformable pretensioning device to guide the grinding element in the pressing direction during the grinding process. There may be a stop element to fix the grinding element in a rest position, and an operating element to pull the grinding element off the fitting. It may be possible to move the grinding element sideways during the grinding process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 19/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 15/84 (2006.01); B24B 19/18 (2006.01); D01G 15/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 19/18 (2013.01); D01G 15/38 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

DE 516224 C 19310130 - RICCARDO BERRA

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB GR IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0790099 A1 19970820; EP 0790099 B1 20010502; BR 9700979 A 19980901; DE 19605635 A1 19970828; DE 19605635 C2 19980528; ES 2106718 T1 19971116; ES 2106718 T3 20010616; GR 3036266 T3 20011031; GR 970300033 T1 19971031; ID 15953 A 19970821; IN 188530 B 20021012; JP 3825124 B2 20060920; JP H10548 A 19980106; KR 100427899 B1 20040719; PT 790099 E 20010830; TR 199700116 A2 19970921; TR 199700116 A3 19970921; TW 380073 B 20000121; US 5797788 A 19980825

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160901

2016-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59703456

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150219

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-07-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59703456

- Representative's name: CANZLER & BERGMEIER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2011-07-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59703456

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE CANZLER & BERGMEIER PARTNERSCHA, DE

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090217

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090218

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090302

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090217

2010-04-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090218

2010-02-26 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090902

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091030

2009-10-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090817

2009-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090217

2009-08-24 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20090817

2009-02-27 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20080124

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080227

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080220

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080225

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20080125

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080131

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-04-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-08-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010720

2001-06-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.

2001-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2106718 T3

2001-06-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703456 20010607

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT PT

1999-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990311

1998-04-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980216

1997-11-16 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2106718 T1

1997-11-14 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

1997-10-01 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

1997-09-11 [ITCL] IT: TRANSLATION FOR EP CLAIMS FILED

- Representative's name: ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.

1997-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT PT