Global Patent Index - EP 0790125 B1

EP 0790125 B1 2000-04-19 - Device for cleaning the surface of a cylinder in a rotary printing machine

Title (en)

Device for cleaning the surface of a cylinder in a rotary printing machine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Reinigen der Mantelfläche von Zylindern in Rotationsdruckmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour nettoyer la surface d'un cylindre dans une machine d'impression rotative

Publication

EP 0790125 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97101504 A

Priority

DE 19605957 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0790125A1] The cleaning device cleans the surfaces of cylinders (1). A cleaning cloth (4) extends over the length of the cylinder. A pressing element acts on the cloth to press it to the cylinder. The pressing element consists of an elastically deformable hollow body (5). When internal pressure is applied to the hollow body, it expands elastically, increasing the spacing towards the cylinder surface. Air is supplied to the hollow body via a two-way valve (8). The two-way valve can be switched from excess pressure to negative pressure, so that the hollow body can pass from an outward position via a neutral rest position to a position stretched inwards.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 35/06 (2006.01); B41F 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 35/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0790125 A1 19970820; EP 0790125 B1 20000419; CZ 9700149 A3 19970917; DE 19605957 A1 19970821; JP H09220805 A 19970826; US 5784962 A 19980728

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2005-01-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050128

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050118

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-09-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2002-12-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021224

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-09-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-06 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20010206

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000522

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701458 20000525

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990604

1997-08-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970131

1997-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI