Global Patent Index - EP 0790203 B1

EP 0790203 B1 2000-04-05 - Device for separating flat piled articles

Title (en)

Device for separating flat piled articles

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Vereinzeln gestapelter flacher Werkstücke

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour séparer des produits plats empilés

Publication

EP 0790203 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96120471 A

Priority

DE 19605461 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0790203A2] The separating device consists of a carrier star (3) with drive. In which rolls (7) are set in a circle round the turning axis (2). Their drive gears (6) are driven from a central gear (5) via intermediate gears (4). The central gear rotates the opposite way to the carrier star. Each roll has a row of suckers (8), so that the rows form a shell cylinder, against which the stack cassette (10) is placed so that each row of each roll pulls out one workpiece to be taken onto a conveyor belt. The stack cassette locks the stack completely to prevent it vibrating.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 3/42; B65H 1/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/10 (2006.01); B65H 1/30 (2006.01); B65H 3/08 (2006.01); B65H 3/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/42 (2013.01); B65H 1/30 (2013.01); B65H 2406/3312 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0790203 A2 19970820; EP 0790203 A3 19980107; EP 0790203 B1 20000405; AT 191424 T 20000415; BR 9700951 A 19980901; CN 1079362 C 20020220; CN 1165107 A 19971119; CZ 9700059 A3 19971217; DE 19605461 A1 19970821; DE 19605461 C2 19990602; ES 2144197 T3 20000601; JP H09226958 A 19970902; TW 330190 B 19980421; US 5857829 A 19990112

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2006-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-12-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051219

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20021220

2003-10-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-09-01 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-08-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20021219

2002-12-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021220

2002-12-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021219

2002-12-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021219

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20011227

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-12-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011220

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-12-12 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20011212

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-11-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20011127

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000615

2000-07-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2144197 T3

2000-05-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604886 20000511

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2000-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191424 T 20000415

1999-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990118

1998-09-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980707

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

1997-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT