Global Patent Index - EP 0790334 B1

EP 0790334 B1 2000-09-27 - Easily dyeable meta-linkage-containing aromatic polyamide fibres

Title (en)

Easily dyeable meta-linkage-containing aromatic polyamide fibres

Title (de)

Leicht färbbare Metabindungen enthaltende aromatische Polyamidfasern

Title (fr)

Fibres de polyamides aromatiques avec liaisons en position méta, pouvant être aisément teintes

Publication

EP 0790334 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96102132 A

Priority

  • EP 96102132 A
  • JP 21573694 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0790334A1] Easily dyeable meta-linkage-containing aromatic polyamide fibers consisting of a composition which comprises a meta-linkage-containing aromatic polyamide incorporating an alkylbenzenesulfonic acid onium salt. They are easily dyeable with cationic dyes, and thus may be used in the fields of bedding, clothing and interior decoration.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01F 6/60; D01F 1/07; D01F 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08G 69/32 (2006.01); D01F 1/07 (2006.01); D01F 1/10 (2006.01); D01F 6/60 (2006.01); D01F 6/90 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01F 1/07 (2013.01); D01F 1/10 (2013.01); D01F 6/605 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0790334 A1 19970820; EP 0790334 B1 20000927; DE 69610484 D1 20001102; DE 69610484 T2 20010510; ES 2150031 T3 20001116; JP 2971338 B2 19991102; JP H0881827 A 19960326

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150215

2016-03-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160329

2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150302

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150214

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150214

2015-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151030

2015-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150214

2015-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69610484

2015-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100228

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140214

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140225

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-05-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140225

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-12-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110901

2011-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-09-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110901

2011-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TEIJIN LTD

- Effective date: 20110228

2010-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100105

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2000-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150031 T3

2000-11-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69610484 20001102

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-01-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980825

1998-10-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980825

1998-03-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980103

1997-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL